Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Community Improvement Association Of Lake Conroe Hills, Inc., filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Charles M Jordan, against Rivera, Argentina D, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Wood, Cara JudgmentAwarded To: Community Improvement Association of Lake Conroe Hills, Inc.Awarded Against: Argentina Rivera presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWood, Cara JudgmentAwarded To: Community Improvement Association of Lake Conroe Hills, Inc.Awarded Against: Argentina Rivera Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2013 |
CategoryReal Property - Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Request
Date: September 16, 2014Proposed Order
Date: April 03, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution
Judge: Wood, Cara JudgmentAwarded To: Community Improvement Association of Lake Conroe Hills, Inc.Awarded Against: Argentina Rivera |
|
September 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Writ of Execution Request Judge: Wood, Cara JudgmentAwarded To: Community Improvement Association of Lake Conroe Hills, Inc.Awarded Against: Argentina Rivera |
|
July 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
ServiceRivera, Argentina D Unserved
Judge: Wood, Cara JudgmentAwarded To: Community Improvement Association of Lake Conroe Hills, Inc.Awarded Against: Argentina Rivera |
|
July 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Abstract
Judge: Wood, Cara JudgmentAwarded To: Community Improvement Association of Lake Conroe Hills, Inc.Awarded Against: Argentina Rivera |
|
July 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request For Service
Judge: Wood, Cara JudgmentAwarded To: Community Improvement Association of Lake Conroe Hills, Inc.Awarded Against: Argentina Rivera |
|
June 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Wood, Cara JudgmentAwarded To: Community Improvement Association of Lake Conroe Hills, Inc.Awarded Against: Argentina Rivera |
|
May 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry
Judge: Wood, Cara JudgmentAwarded To: Community Improvement Association of Lake Conroe Hills, Inc.Awarded Against: Argentina Rivera |
|
May 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court
Judge: Wood, Cara JudgmentAwarded To: Community Improvement Association of Lake Conroe Hills, Inc.Awarded Against: Argentina Rivera |
|
April 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Submission (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wood, Cara)
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proposed Default Judgment Proposed Order Judge: Wood, Cara JudgmentAwarded To: Community Improvement Association of Lake Conroe Hills, Inc.Awarded Against: Argentina Rivera |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.