Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Anh H Regent, against Soltis, Lynda, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Wood, Cara presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWood, Cara Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2013 |
CategoryContract Consumer/Commercial/Debt <$100,000 Incl. Damages |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Signed Order
Date: January 29, 2015Order
Date: September 08, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
March 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Dismiss for Want of Prosecution CANCELED Dismiss for Want of Prosecution (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Wood, Cara) Case Disposed Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
March 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Nonsuit
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
January 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Court's Cover Letter (Dismissal) , Order Setting Hearing Signed Order Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Submission (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wood, Cara) 08/20/2014Reset by Court to 09/24/201409/24/2014Reset by Court to 01/07/2015
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
November 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
September 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Final Default Judgment Order Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
September 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion (No Fee)
Judge: Wood, Cara |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.