Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Warren, Shirley, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Tommy R Hastings, against Chca Conroe, L.P., Johnson, Mark Alan, Md, Mark Alan Johnson, M.D., P.A., represented by Nicole G Andrews, Sam Houston, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Wood, Cara presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWood, Cara Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2013 |
CategoryInj/Damage-Medical Malpractice >$200,000 |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Proposed Order
Date: May 20, 2014Original Answer
Date: February 03, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
May 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
May 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
May 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order on Nonsuit Proposed Order Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
May 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Nonsuit
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
February 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer Original Answer Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
January 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Jury Fee Paid
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
January 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Deft Mark Alan Johnson, M.D & Mark Alan Johnson, M.D., P.A.'s Original Answer, Request for Disclosur Answer Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
CitationCHCA Conroe, L.P. Unserved Johnson, Mark Alan, MD Unserved Mark Alan Johnson, M.D., P.A. Unserved
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA)
Judge: Wood, Cara |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.