Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Isahac, Yahseen A, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Robert A Rosenquist, against Tarrant, Dee Rains, represented by Catherine Herrington-Hale, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Gilbert, Tracy A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGilbert, Tracy A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2013 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment After Non-Jury Trial |
Letters
Date: October 24, 2014Letters
Date: October 23, 2014Order
Date: July 02, 2014Proposed Order
Date: June 30, 2014Proposed Order
Date: April 23, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
November 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
November 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
November 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Entry (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A) 11/13/2014Reset by Court to 11/20/2014
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
November 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial CANCELED Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A) Other11/03/2014Reset by Court to 11/04/2014 Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
October 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
October 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Appeal
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
October 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Inventory & Appraisement of Dee Rains Tarrant Letters Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
October 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
October 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A)
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.