Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Litts, Shane Ray, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Litts, Valerie Strange, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Gilbert, Tracy A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGilbert, Tracy A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2013 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment After Non-Jury Trial |
Answer
Date: November 25, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Pro Se Bench Trial CANCELED Pro Se Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A) Agreed Resolution Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
February 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Pro Se Pre-Trial CANCELED Pro Se Pre-Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A) Agreed Resolution Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Prove-Up (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A)
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
December 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Parenting Certificate
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
November 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Respondent Valerie Litts' Answer to Divorce Answer Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
November 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Parenting Certificate
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
March 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.