Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mcphie, William, Mcphie, Douglas, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by William S Featherston, against Jackson, Laurie, Hennard, Anthony Michale, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Wood, Cara presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWood, Cara Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2013 |
CategoryInj/Damage-Motor Vehicle >$200,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Proposed Order
Date: July 29, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
July 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion (No Fee)
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
July 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
July 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
July 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order of Nonsuit Proposed Order Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
July 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Submission (4:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Wood, Cara) 07/03/2014Reset by Court to 07/10/2014
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
June 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Submission (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wood, Cara)
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
June 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
June 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
January 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
CitationHennard, Anthony Michale Unserved Jackson, Laurie Unserved
Judge: Wood, Cara |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.