Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bloodsworth, Stacy Denise, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Carrington, Clinton Edwin, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with : Gilbert, Tracy A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 22, 2013 |
CategorySupport - Ivd |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment After Non-Jury Trial |
Proposed Order
Date: January 17, 2017Proposed Order
Date: July 13, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order-Proposed Income Withholding for Support Proposed Order Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry (Judicial Officer: Gilbert, Tracy A )
Judge: : Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Entry (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A)
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry (Judicial Officer: Gilbert, Tracy A )
Judge: : Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Prove-Up (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A) 12/14/2016Reset by Court to 01/03/2017
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry (Judicial Officer: Gilbert, Tracy A )
Judge: : Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Certificate
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Parenting Certificate
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.