Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
FILIMON PEREZ-REYNA VS CHRISTINA ASHLEY PEREZ-REYNA
A Divorce - No Children case was filed by Perez-Reyna, Filimon, against Perez-Reyna, Christina Ashley, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX. Judge : Gilbert, Tracy A presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 27, 2013
Last Refreshed
February 20, 2021
Filing Location
Montgomery County, TX
Category
Divorce - No Children
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Case Outcome Type
Final Decree
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial CANCELED Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A) Per Judge Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
June 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Hearing CANCELED Pre-Trial Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A) Per Judge Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
March 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
March 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
March 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Prove-Up (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A)
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
February 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
February 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
November 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Original Petition FOR DIVORCE Original Petition (OCA) (Judicial Officer: Gilbert, Tracy A ) Judge: : Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
November 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
INFORMATION SHEET Letters (Judicial Officer: Gilbert, Tracy A ) Judge: : Gilbert, Tracy A |