Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Conroe Isd, Montgomery County, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by M Kaye Brouse, against Smith, Marvin, Smith, Phyllis, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with : Wood, Cara presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 12, 2013 |
CategoryTax Case |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Proposed Order
Date: March 25, 2014Motion to Dismiss
Date: March 25, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury CANCELED Non-Jury (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wood, Cara) Case Disposed02/13/2014Reset by Court to 06/26/2014 Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
March 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
March 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
2193847_DISM ORD Proposed Order Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
2193847_DISM MOTION Motion to Dismiss Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
March 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Original Answer
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
March 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Return of Service
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order for Continuance
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
February 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Citation
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
February 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
CitationSMITH, PHYLLIS Unserved
Judge: Wood, Cara |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.