Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lo, Millie Sum, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hau, Mark, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with : Gilbert, Tracy A presiding.
Case Number |
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment After Non-Jury Trial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court (Judicial Officer: Gilbert, Tracy A )
Judge: : Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
May 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion (1:30 PM) ()
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A Party(HAU, MARKParty(LO, MILLIE SUM |
|
April 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Court Date Notes (Other) (Judicial Officer: Gilbert, Tracy A )
Judge: : Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
March 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
WAIVER OF SERVICE Answer (Judicial Officer: Gilbert, Tracy A ) Judge: : Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
March 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
Court Date Notes (Other) (Judicial Officer: Gilbert, Tracy A )
Judge: : Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
PETITION FOR DIVORCE Original Petition (OCA) (Judicial Officer: Gilbert, Tracy A ) Judge: : Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court (Judicial Officer: Gilbert, Tracy A )
Judge: : Gilbert, Tracy A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.