Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Stephens, Michelle Blair, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Stephens, Jason Michael, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with : Gilbert, Tracy A presiding.
Case Number |
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2011 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeChange Of Venue Transfer |
Signed Order
Date: April 07, 2015Signed Order
Date: May 26, 2015Order to Appear and Show Cause
Date: February 26, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
September 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Enforcement (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Durst, J.C.)
Judge: Durst, J.C. |
|
September 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
September 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry (Judicial Officer: Durst, J.C. )
Judge: : Durst, J.C. |
|
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
August 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
(Title IV-D OAG Use Only) Service Documents
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
August 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Enforcement (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Durst, J.C.) 04/07/2015Reset by Court to 05/26/201505/26/2015Reset by Court to 08/06/2015
Judge: Durst, J.C. |
|
August 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry (Judicial Officer: Durst, J.C. )
Judge: : Durst, J.C. |
|
July 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
CitationSTEPHENS, JASON MICHAELServed08/13/2015Returned08/19/2015
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
July 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Information Sheet
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.