Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2005-2, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Anh H Regent, against Cygan, Devon, Cygan, Cory, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with : Case, Kelly W presiding.
Case Number |
Judge: Case, Kelly W Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2011 |
CategoryContract Consumer/Comm/Debt >$100,000 But <$200,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeSummary Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial (9:00 AM) ()
Judge: Case, Kelly W Party(CYGAN, DEVONParty(NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2005-2Party(CYGAN, CORY |
|
August 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court (Judicial Officer: Case, Kelly W )
Judge: : Case, Kelly W |
|
August 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion (9:00 AM) ()
Judge: Case, Kelly W Party(CYGAN, DEVONParty(NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2005-2Party(CYGAN, CORY |
|
August 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL ANSWER Order (Judicial Officer: Case, Kelly W ) Judge: : Case, Kelly W |
|
August 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
Court Date Notes (Other) (Judicial Officer: Case, Kelly W )
Judge: : Case, Kelly W |
|
June 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON MTN FOR CONTINUANCE Order (Judicial Officer: Case, Kelly W ) Judge: : Case, Kelly W |
|
June 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury (9:00 AM) ()
Judge: Case, Kelly W Party(CYGAN, DEVONParty(NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2005-2Party(CYGAN, CORY |
|
March 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
DEFT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER Answer (Judicial Officer: Case, Kelly W ) Judge: : Case, Kelly W |
|
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Service (Judicial Officer: Case, Kelly W )
Judge: : Case, Kelly W |
|
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Citation
Judge: Case, Kelly W Party(CYGAN, DEVONParty(NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2005-2Party(CYGAN, CORY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.