Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
21St Mortgage Corporation As Assignee From The Cit Group Sales Financing,Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Richard A Mckinney, against Cox, Justin, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with : Hamilton, Kathleen presiding.
Case Number |
Judge: Hamilton, Kathleen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2011 |
CategoryContract Consumer/Comm/Debt >$100,000 But <$200,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed For Want Of Prosecution |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Dismiss for Want of Prosecution (8:00 AM) ()
Judge: Hamilton, Kathleen Party(COX, JUSTINParty(21ST MORTGAGE CORPORATION AS ASSIGNEE FROM THE CIT GROUP/SALES FINANCING,INC. |
|
March 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court (Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Kathleen )
Judge: : Hamilton, Kathleen |
|
March 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion (8:00 AM) ()
Judge: Hamilton, Kathleen Party(COX, JUSTINParty(21ST MORTGAGE CORPORATION AS ASSIGNEE FROM THE CIT GROUP/SALES FINANCING,INC. |
|
February 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Court Date Notes (Other) (Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Kathleen )
Judge: : Hamilton, Kathleen |
|
November 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion (12:30 AM) ()
Judge: Hamilton, Kathleen Party(COX, JUSTINParty(21ST MORTGAGE CORPORATION AS ASSIGNEE FROM THE CIT GROUP/SALES FINANCING,INC. |
|
October 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Court Date Notes (Other) (Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Kathleen )
Judge: : Hamilton, Kathleen |
|
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Citation (Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Kathleen )
Judge: : Hamilton, Kathleen |
|
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Citation
Judge: Hamilton, Kathleen Party(COX, JUSTINParty(21ST MORTGAGE CORPORATION AS ASSIGNEE FROM THE CIT GROUP/SALES FINANCING,INC. |
|
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court (Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Kathleen )
Judge: : Hamilton, Kathleen |
|
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) (Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Kathleen )
Judge: : Hamilton, Kathleen |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.