Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Montgomery, Montgomery Isd, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by M Kaye Brouse, against Cervantes, Hector, Walden On Lake Conroe Cia, represented by Charles M Jordan, Tony Duckworth, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with : Wood, Cara presiding.
Case Number |
Judge: Wood, Cara Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2011 |
CategoryTax Case |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment After Non-Jury Trial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court (Judicial Officer: Wood, Cara )
Judge: : Wood, Cara |
|
February 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution (Judicial Officer: Wood, Cara )
Judge: : Wood, Cara |
|
August 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury (9:00 AM) ()
Judge: Wood, Cara Party(CERVANTES, HECTORParty(WALDEN ON LAKE CONROE CIA |
|
August 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Court Date Notes Tax (Other) (Judicial Officer: Wood, Cara )
Judge: : Wood, Cara |
|
August 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court (Judicial Officer: Wood, Cara )
Judge: : Wood, Cara |
|
June 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Images Answer (Judicial Officer: Wood, Cara ) Judge: : Wood, Cara |
|
May 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Images Order (Judicial Officer: Wood, Cara ) Judge: : Wood, Cara |
|
April 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
Service (Judicial Officer: Wood, Cara )
Judge: : Wood, Cara |
|
March 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Citation
Judge: Wood, Cara Party(CERVANTES, HECTORParty(WALDEN ON LAKE CONROE CIA |
|
March 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Citation (Judicial Officer: Wood, Cara )
Judge: : Wood, Cara |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.