Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Barber, Timothy Marc, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Barber, Catrina Shearer, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with : Gilbert, Tracy A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2009 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment After Non-Jury Trial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court (Judicial Officer: Gilbert, Tracy A )
Judge: : Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
April 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion (9:00 AM) ()
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A Party(BARBER, TIMOTHY MARCParty(BARBER, CATRINA SHEARER |
|
March 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Court Date Notes (Other) (Judicial Officer: Gilbert, Tracy A )
Judge: : Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
March 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion (9:00 AM) ()
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A Party(BARBER, TIMOTHY MARCParty(BARBER, CATRINA SHEARER |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion (9:00 AM) ()
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A Party(BARBER, TIMOTHY MARCParty(BARBER, CATRINA SHEARER |
|
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING MTN CONTINUANCE Order (Judicial Officer: Gilbert, Tracy A ) Judge: : Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion (9:00 AM) ()
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A Party(BARBER, TIMOTHY MARCParty(BARBER, CATRINA SHEARER |
|
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court (Judicial Officer: Gilbert, Tracy A )
Judge: : Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Court Date Notes (Other) (Judicial Officer: Gilbert, Tracy A )
Judge: : Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
November 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORIG ANSWER AND FIRST AMENDED COUNTER-PETITION Answer (Judicial Officer: Gilbert, Tracy A ) Judge: : Gilbert, Tracy A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.