Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Magnolia Isd, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Michael J Darlow, against Crestar Mortgage, Inc. Fka, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Stinson, Guy, Suntrust Mortgage, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with : Wood, Cara presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2009 |
CategoryTax Case |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court (Judicial Officer: Wood, Cara )
Judge: : Wood, Cara |
|
October 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury (9:00 AM) ()
Judge: Wood, Cara Party(STINSON, GUYParty(SUNTRUST MORTGAGE, INC.Party(MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INCParty(CRESTAR MORTGAGE, INC. FKA |
|
October 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Court Date Notes Tax (Other) (Judicial Officer: Wood, Cara )
Judge: : Wood, Cara |
|
February 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Service (Judicial Officer: Wood, Cara )
Judge: : Wood, Cara |
|
February 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Service (Judicial Officer: Wood, Cara )
Judge: : Wood, Cara |
|
February 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court (Judicial Officer: Wood, Cara )
Judge: : Wood, Cara |
|
February 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Service (Judicial Officer: Wood, Cara )
Judge: : Wood, Cara |
|
January 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Citation (Judicial Officer: Wood, Cara )
Judge: : Wood, Cara |
|
January 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Citation
Judge: Wood, Cara Party(STINSON, GUYParty(SUNTRUST MORTGAGE, INC.Party(MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INCParty(CRESTAR MORTGAGE, INC. FKA |
|
January 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
Images Original Petition Non-Mapped (Judicial Officer: Wood, Cara ) Judge: : Wood, Cara |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.