Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sargent, Annette Marie, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Kirk, Donald Gene, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with : Hamilton, Kathleen presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 03, 1991 |
CategoryPaternity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2000 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court (Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Kathleen )
Judge: : Hamilton, Kathleen |
|
July 22, 1996 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court (Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Kathleen )
Judge: : Hamilton, Kathleen |
|
April 02, 1991 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court (Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Kathleen )
Judge: : Hamilton, Kathleen |
|
January 30, 1991 | Docket Event |
Original Petition Non-Mapped (Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Kathleen )
Judge: : Hamilton, Kathleen |
|
January 30, 1991 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court (Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Kathleen )
Judge: : Hamilton, Kathleen |
|
January 03, 1991 | Docket Event |
FIRST AMENDED PETITION Original Petition Non-Mapped (Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Kathleen ) Judge: : Hamilton, Kathleen |
|
January 03, 1991 | Docket Event |
FIRST AMENDED PETITION Original Petition (OCA) (Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Kathleen ) Judge: : Hamilton, Kathleen |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.