Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ge Money Bank D B A, General Electric Capital Corporation D B A Ge Money Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Christopher D Osborn, against Stone, Mitzi, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with : Case, Kelly W presiding.
Case Number |
Judge: Case, Kelly W Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryContract Consumer/Comm/Debt >$100,000 But <$200,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial (9:30 AM) ()
Judge: Case, Kelly W Party(STONE, MITZIParty(GE MONEY BANK D/B/AParty(GENERAL ELECTRIC CAPITAL CORPORATION D/B/A GE MONEY BANK |
|
September 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court (Judicial Officer: Case, Kelly W )
Judge: : Case, Kelly W |
|
September 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion (9:00 AM) ()
Judge: Case, Kelly W Party(STONE, MITZIParty(GE MONEY BANK D/B/AParty(GENERAL ELECTRIC CAPITAL CORPORATION D/B/A GE MONEY BANK |
|
August 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Court Date Notes (Other) (Judicial Officer: Case, Kelly W )
Judge: : Case, Kelly W |
|
August 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Court Date Notes (Other) (Judicial Officer: Case, Kelly W )
Judge: : Case, Kelly W |
|
January 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Service (Judicial Officer: Case, Kelly W )
Judge: : Case, Kelly W |
|
January 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Citation (Judicial Officer: Case, Kelly W )
Judge: : Case, Kelly W |
|
January 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Citation
Judge: Case, Kelly W Party(STONE, MITZIParty(GE MONEY BANK D/B/AParty(GENERAL ELECTRIC CAPITAL CORPORATION D/B/A GE MONEY BANK |
|
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) (Judicial Officer: Case, Kelly W )
Judge: : Case, Kelly W |
|
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court (Judicial Officer: Case, Kelly W )
Judge: : Case, Kelly W |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.