Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Fuller, Lauren Lenelle, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Terry, Joshua Scott, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with : Wood, Cara presiding.
Case Number |
Judge: Wood, Cara Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2008 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Agreed Order
Date: February 19, 2019Signed Order
Date: December 18, 2018Post-Judgment - Enforcement (OCA)
Date: March 31, 2017Proposed Order
Date: March 22, 2017Scheduling Order
Date: November 09, 2016Signed Order
Date: November 09, 2016Proposed Order
Date: November 02, 2016Proposed Order
Date: October 27, 2016Proposed Order
Date: October 26, 2016Proposed Order
Date: August 31, 2016Answer
Date: August 11, 2016Proposed Order
Date: July 19, 2016Answer
Date: December 23, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Signed Agreed Order Confirming Support Arrearage Agreed Order Judge: Durst, J.C. |
|
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry (Judicial Officer: Durst, J.C. )
Judge: : Durst, J.C. |
|
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Enforcement (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Durst, J.C.)
Judge: Durst, J.C. |
|
January 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service
Judge: Durst, J.C. |
|
December 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Signed/Order Setting Hearing on February 19, 2019 at 9:00 A.M. Signed Order Judge: Durst, J.C. |
|
December 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
CitationFuller, Lauren LenelleServed12/27/2018Returned12/31/2018
Judge: Durst, J.C. |
|
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Information Sheet
Judge: Durst, J.C. |
|
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request For Service
Judge: Durst, J.C. |
|
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
(Title IV-D OAG Use Only) Enforcement
Judge: Durst, J.C. |
|
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court
Judge: Durst, J.C. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.