Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Edward T Burke, against Labarge, Dianne M., in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with : Case, Kelly W presiding.
Case Number |
Judge: Case, Kelly W Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2008 |
CategoryContract Consumer/Commercial/Debt >$200,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial (9:30 AM) ()
Judge: Case, Kelly W Party(LABARGE, DIANNE M.Party(PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES |
|
November 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court (Judicial Officer: Case, Kelly W )
Judge: : Case, Kelly W |
|
August 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Court Date Notes (Other) (Judicial Officer: Case, Kelly W )
Judge: : Case, Kelly W |
|
July 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER SERVICE / RULE 106 Order (Judicial Officer: Case, Kelly W ) Judge: : Case, Kelly W |
|
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Citation
Judge: Case, Kelly W Party(LABARGE, DIANNE M.Party(PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES |
|
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Citation (Judicial Officer: Case, Kelly W )
Judge: : Case, Kelly W |
|
December 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S ORIG PET Original Petition (OCA) (Judicial Officer: Case, Kelly W ) Judge: : Case, Kelly W |
|
December 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court (Judicial Officer: Case, Kelly W )
Judge: : Case, Kelly W |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.