Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Walton, Olen Del, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Walton, Sharon Rene, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with : Gilbert, Tracy A presiding.
Case Number |
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2008 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
ADMIN WRIT W/HOLDING Letters (Judicial Officer: Gilbert, Tracy A ) Judge: : Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
July 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
WAGE WITHHHOLDING ISSUED Letters (Judicial Officer: Gilbert, Tracy A ) Judge: : Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
July 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court (Judicial Officer: Gilbert, Tracy A )
Judge: : Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
July 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion (1:30 PM) ()
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A Party(WALTON, SHARON RENEParty(WALTON, OLEN DEL |
|
April 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Court Date Notes (Other) (Judicial Officer: Gilbert, Tracy A )
Judge: : Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
February 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court (Judicial Officer: Gilbert, Tracy A )
Judge: : Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
February 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Court Date Notes (Other) (Judicial Officer: Gilbert, Tracy A )
Judge: : Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
December 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) (Judicial Officer: Gilbert, Tracy A )
Judge: : Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
December 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court (Judicial Officer: Gilbert, Tracy A )
Judge: : Gilbert, Tracy A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.