Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Borden, Misty Renne, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Borden, Ronald Fredrick, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with : Hamilton, Kathleen presiding.
Case Number |
Judge: Hamilton, Kathleen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2008 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed For Want Of Prosecution |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion (8:00 AM) ()
Judge: Hamilton, Kathleen Party(BORDEN, MISTY RENNEParty(BORDEN, RONALD FREDRICK |
|
October 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court (Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Kathleen )
Judge: : Hamilton, Kathleen |
|
September 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Court Date Notes (Other) (Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Kathleen )
Judge: : Hamilton, Kathleen |
|
February 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO EXTEND TRO Order (Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Kathleen ) Judge: : Hamilton, Kathleen |
|
February 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
RESPONDENT'S ORG ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM Answer (Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Kathleen ) Judge: : Hamilton, Kathleen |
|
January 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO EXTEND TRO Order (Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Kathleen ) Judge: : Hamilton, Kathleen |
|
January 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
TEMP RESTRAIN ORDER / ORDER SETTING Order (Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Kathleen ) Judge: : Hamilton, Kathleen |
|
January 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Citation
Judge: Hamilton, Kathleen Party(BORDEN, MISTY RENNEParty(BORDEN, RONALD FREDRICK |
|
January 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Service (Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Kathleen )
Judge: : Hamilton, Kathleen |
|
January 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Citation (Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Kathleen )
Judge: : Hamilton, Kathleen |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.