Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bhb Leasing, Ltd., filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by William T Fowler, against Tart, Jason W., Epps, Duane, Ace Contracting, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with : Case, Kelly W presiding.
Case Number |
Judge: Case, Kelly W Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2008 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial (9:30 AM) ()
Judge: Case, Kelly W Party(ACE CONTRACTING, INC.Party(EPPS, DUANEParty(TART, JASON W.Party(BHB LEASING, LTD. |
|
August 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Court Date Notes (Other) (Judicial Officer: Case, Kelly W )
Judge: : Case, Kelly W |
|
August 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court (Judicial Officer: Case, Kelly W )
Judge: : Case, Kelly W |
|
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
Citation
Judge: Case, Kelly W Party(ACE CONTRACTING, INC.Party(EPPS, DUANEParty(TART, JASON W.Party(BHB LEASING, LTD. |
|
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
Service (Judicial Officer: Case, Kelly W )
Judge: : Case, Kelly W |
|
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
Citation (Judicial Officer: Case, Kelly W )
Judge: : Case, Kelly W |
|
December 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) (Judicial Officer: Case, Kelly W )
Judge: : Case, Kelly W |
|
December 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court (Judicial Officer: Case, Kelly W )
Judge: : Case, Kelly W |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.