Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Whedbee, Justin, filed a(n) Other Civil Case >$200,000 case represented by Paul A Bezney, against Bayview Loan Servicing Llc, Ib Property Holdings Llc, Interbay Funding, Llc, Riccitello, Robert J., Riccitello, Sunny, (total of 5) See All represented by Lindsay L Lambert, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with : Case, Kelly W presiding.
Case Number |
Judge: Case, Kelly W Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2008 |
CategoryOther Civil Case >$200,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial (9:30 AM) ()
Judge: Case, Kelly W Party(WHEDBEE, JUSTINParty(BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLCParty(RICCITELLO, ROBERT J.Party(RICCITELLO, SUNNYParty(IB PROPERTY HOLDINGS LLCParty(INTERBAY FUNDING, LLC |
|
December 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court (Judicial Officer: Case, Kelly W )
Judge: : Case, Kelly W |
|
December 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial (9:30 AM) ()
Judge: Case, Kelly W Party(WHEDBEE, JUSTINParty(BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLCParty(RICCITELLO, ROBERT J.Party(RICCITELLO, SUNNYParty(IB PROPERTY HOLDINGS LLCParty(INTERBAY FUNDING, LLC |
|
December 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion (9:00 AM) ()
Judge: Case, Kelly W Party(WHEDBEE, JUSTINParty(BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLCParty(RICCITELLO, ROBERT J.Party(RICCITELLO, SUNNYParty(IB PROPERTY HOLDINGS LLCParty(INTERBAY FUNDING, LLC |
|
November 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Court Date Notes (Other) (Judicial Officer: Case, Kelly W )
Judge: : Case, Kelly W |
|
November 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON OBJ / MTN TO STRIKE Order (Judicial Officer: Case, Kelly W ) Judge: : Case, Kelly W |
|
November 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court (Judicial Officer: Case, Kelly W )
Judge: : Case, Kelly W |
|
November 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion (9:00 AM) ()
Judge: Case, Kelly W Party(WHEDBEE, JUSTINParty(BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLCParty(RICCITELLO, ROBERT J.Party(RICCITELLO, SUNNYParty(IB PROPERTY HOLDINGS LLCParty(INTERBAY FUNDING, LLC |
|
October 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion (9:00 AM) ()
Judge: Case, Kelly W Party(WHEDBEE, JUSTINParty(BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLCParty(RICCITELLO, ROBERT J.Party(RICCITELLO, SUNNYParty(IB PROPERTY HOLDINGS LLCParty(INTERBAY FUNDING, LLC |
|
October 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
Court Date Notes (Other) (Judicial Officer: Case, Kelly W )
Judge: : Case, Kelly W |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.