Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ward, Amanda, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ward, Vonta Vishon, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with : Michalk, Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
Judge: Michalk, Lisa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2008 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed For Want Of Prosecution |
Order
Date: April 08, 2009Order
Date: March 19, 2009Order
Date: December 22, 2008Answer
Date: January 05, 2009Order
Date: January 20, 2009Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 22, 2008Original Petition Non-Mapped
Date: December 22, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court (Judicial Officer: Michalk, Lisa )
Judge: : Michalk, Lisa |
|
November 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Docket Call (10:00 AM) ()
Judge: Michalk, Lisa Party(Ward, AmandaParty(Ward, Vonta Vishon |
|
September 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
Court Date Notes (Other) (Judicial Officer: Michalk, Lisa )
Judge: : Michalk, Lisa |
|
May 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court (Judicial Officer: Michalk, Lisa )
Judge: : Michalk, Lisa |
|
April 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion (9:00 AM) ()
Judge: Michalk, Lisa Party(Ward, AmandaParty(Ward, Vonta Vishon |
|
April 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL Order (Judicial Officer: Michalk, Lisa ) Judge: : Michalk, Lisa |
|
March 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Court Date Notes (Other) (Judicial Officer: Michalk, Lisa )
Judge: : Michalk, Lisa |
|
March 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion (9:00 AM) ()
Judge: Michalk, Lisa Party(Ward, AmandaParty(Ward, Vonta Vishon |
|
March 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL Order (Judicial Officer: Michalk, Lisa ) Judge: : Michalk, Lisa |
|
March 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Court Date Notes (Other) (Judicial Officer: Michalk, Lisa )
Judge: : Michalk, Lisa |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.