Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Jorgensen, Steven Charles, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case against Talkin, Mari, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with : Hamilton, Kathleen presiding.
Case Number |
Judge: Hamilton, Kathleen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2008 |
CategoryPost Judgment Action Modification Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed For Want Of Prosecution |
Letters
Date: August 15, 2018Proposed Order
Date: March 13, 2018Proposed Order
Date: January 25, 2018Request
Date: September 07, 2017Request
Date: June 01, 2016Post Judgment - Modification - Other (OCA)
Date: February 11, 2016Letters
Date: September 14, 2015Letters
Date: November 15, 2010Answer
Date: March 29, 2010Amended Petition
Date: February 08, 2010Letters
Date: January 12, 2010Order
Date: February 10, 2009Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 19, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Returned Clerk's Notice Letter to Mari Talkin Letters Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Dismiss for Want of Prosecution (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A)
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
July 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion CANCELED Motion (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gilbert, Tracy A) Other Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Authorizing Service of Process Proposed Order Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit
Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
|
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order on Motion for Alternative Service Proposed Order Judge: Gilbert, Tracy A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.