Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Edwards, William, Edwards, Lynda, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Russell E Mackert, against Watson, Kyle, Pilgrim Contractors, Inc., Caranza, Elise, represented by C. L. Crawley, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with : Wood, Cara presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2006 |
CategoryContract Consumer/Commercial/Debt >$200,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed For Want Of Prosecution |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Wood, Cara Party(CARANZA, ELISEParty(WATSON, KYLEParty(EDWARDS, LYNDAParty(EDWARDS, WILLIAMParty(PILGRIM CONTRACTORS, INC. |
|
June 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion (8:30 AM) ()
Judge: Wood, Cara Party(CARANZA, ELISEParty(WATSON, KYLEParty(EDWARDS, LYNDAParty(EDWARDS, WILLIAMParty(PILGRIM CONTRACTORS, INC. |
|
June 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court (Judicial Officer: Wood, Cara )
Judge: : Wood, Cara |
|
May 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
SHOW CAUSE ORDER Order (Judicial Officer: Wood, Cara ) Judge: : Wood, Cara |
|
May 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Court Date Notes (Other) (Judicial Officer: Wood, Cara )
Judge: : Wood, Cara |
|
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court (Judicial Officer: Wood, Cara )
Judge: : Wood, Cara |
|
January 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court (Judicial Officer: Wood, Cara )
Judge: : Wood, Cara |
|
June 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial (9:00 AM) ()
Judge: Wood, Cara Party(CARANZA, ELISEParty(WATSON, KYLEParty(EDWARDS, LYNDAParty(EDWARDS, WILLIAMParty(PILGRIM CONTRACTORS, INC. |
|
December 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Court Date Notes (Other) (Judicial Officer: Wood, Cara )
Judge: : Wood, Cara |
|
February 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial (9:00 AM) ()
Judge: Wood, Cara Party(CARANZA, ELISEParty(WATSON, KYLEParty(EDWARDS, LYNDAParty(EDWARDS, WILLIAMParty(PILGRIM CONTRACTORS, INC. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.