Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Chicago Bridge & Iron Company, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Amanda Trapp, against Certain London Market Insurance Companies, Certain Underwriters At Lloyd'S, Certain Underwriters At Lloyd'S, London, London And Certain London Market Insurance Companies, represented by Alfonso Castro-Cardenas, Wesley Yuan, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with : Wood, Cara presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2006 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Proposed Order
Date: March 03, 2017Signed Order
Date: January 05, 2017Proposed Order
Date: December 23, 2016Proposed Order
Date: December 09, 2016Signed Order
Date: December 07, 2016Letters
Date: November 18, 2016Signed Order
Date: September 22, 2016Signed Order
Date: May 04, 2016Signed Order
Date: April 21, 2016Signed Order
Date: February 26, 2016Letters
Date: March 24, 2016Letters
Date: February 22, 2016Letters
Date: February 16, 2016Letters
Date: February 09, 2016Letters
Date: February 04, 2016Letters
Date: February 02, 2016Signed Order
Date: February 02, 2016Letters
Date: February 01, 2016Signed Order
Date: January 22, 2016Signed Order
Date: January 08, 2016Proposed Order
Date: December 09, 2015Answer
Date: December 09, 2015Response
Date: December 07, 2015Proposed Order
Date: November 19, 2015Letters
Date: October 15, 2015Letters
Date: October 08, 2015Proposed Order
Date: September 23, 2015Letters
Date: June 30, 2015Proposed Order
Date: May 08, 2015Letters
Date: April 23, 2015Signed Order
Date: April 01, 2015Signed Order
Date: February 27, 2015Letters
Date: February 13, 2015Signed Order
Date: January 26, 2015Signed Order
Date: January 23, 2015Response
Date: January 15, 2015Letters
Date: January 07, 2015Amended Petition
Date: November 04, 2014Answer
Date: October 20, 2014Response
Date: September 30, 2014Cross Action/Counterpetition
Date: September 29, 2014Objection
Date: September 22, 2014Proposed Order
Date: September 15, 2014Proposed Order
Date: September 04, 2014Amended Petition
Date: September 04, 2014Signed Order
Date: July 01, 2014Proposed Order
Date: July 01, 2014Signed Order
Date: May 23, 2014Proposed Order
Date: May 22, 2014Letters
Date: May 12, 2014Letters
Date: May 01, 2014Signed Order
Date: April 10, 2014Proposed Order
Date: April 09, 2014Letters
Date: April 01, 2014Letters
Date: March 25, 2014Order
Date: February 28, 2014Proposed Order
Date: February 20, 2014Letters
Date: December 26, 2013Order
Date: December 10, 2013Order
Date: May 16, 2013Order
Date: February 20, 2013Order
Date: November 18, 2010Order
Date: October 27, 2010Order
Date: October 19, 2010Order
Date: September 13, 2010Order
Date: August 20, 2010Order
Date: July 19, 2010Order
Date: July 16, 2010Order
Date: July 01, 2010Order
Date: July 08, 2010Order
Date: June 21, 2010Order
Date: April 06, 2010Order
Date: January 07, 2010Order
Date: November 18, 2009Order
Date: October 23, 2009Order
Date: October 19, 2009Order
Date: October 06, 2009Order
Date: September 14, 2009Order
Date: July 27, 2009Order
Date: October 29, 2008Order
Date: May 13, 2008Order
Date: April 01, 2008Order
Date: April 13, 2007Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 28, 2006Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
May 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
No Fee Documents
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
May 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
May 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Wood, Cara)
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
May 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
April 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion (No Fee)
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
April 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Submission (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wood, Cara) 03/03/2017Continued to 03/17/2017 - Agreed by Parties - Certain London Market Insurance Companies; Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's; Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London; Chicago Bridge & Iron Company; London and Certain London Market Insurance Companies03/17/2017Reset by Court to 03/31/201703/31/2017Continued to 04/28/2017 - Reset - Certain London Market Insurance Companies; Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's; Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London; Chicago Bridge & Iron Company; London and Certain London Market Insurance Companies
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
No Fee Documents
Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
March 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order on Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for Status Report Proposed Order Judge: Wood, Cara |
|
March 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion (No Fee)
Judge: Wood, Cara |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.