Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hudson & Keyse, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Anh H Regent, against Schandorff, Cleland H, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with : Hamilton, Kathleen presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2006 |
CategoryContract Consumer/Comm/Debt >$100,000 But <$200,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment After Non-Jury Trial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
Service
Judge: Hamilton, Kathleen Party(HUDSON & KEYSE, LLCParty(SCHANDORFF, CLELAND H |
|
October 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
Service (Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Kathleen )
Judge: : Hamilton, Kathleen |
|
October 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
Abstract (Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Kathleen )
Judge: : Hamilton, Kathleen |
|
August 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion (9:00 AM) ()
Judge: Hamilton, Kathleen Party(HUDSON & KEYSE, LLCParty(SCHANDORFF, CLELAND H |
|
August 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Minute of the Court (Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Kathleen )
Judge: : Hamilton, Kathleen |
|
May 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
Court Date Notes (Other) (Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Kathleen )
Judge: : Hamilton, Kathleen |
|
April 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
ORDER DENYINT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT Order (Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Kathleen ) Judge: : Hamilton, Kathleen |
|
April 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
Court Date Notes (Other) (Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Kathleen )
Judge: : Hamilton, Kathleen |
|
January 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Citation
Judge: Hamilton, Kathleen Party(HUDSON & KEYSE, LLCParty(SCHANDORFF, CLELAND H |
|
January 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Citation (Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Kathleen )
Judge: : Hamilton, Kathleen |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.