Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Godley Independent School, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case against Wells Fargo Bank,N ,A, Gerdeman, Kimberly Ann, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Bosworth, William C, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 03, 2014 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeCases Non-Suited Or Dismissed By Plaintiff |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry *****************scan box 2552**************** *****************scan box 2552**************** Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice /Order (Ashly Steele Atkins, Wells Fargo, & Kimberly Gerdeman) /Order (Ashly Steele Atkins, Wells Fargo, & Kimberly Gerdeman) Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bosworth, William C, Jr.)
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order of Non-Suit
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order of Nonsuit-sent to court Order of Nonsuit-sent to court Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion to Nonsuit Motion Motion to Nonsuit Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
May 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Dismiss - No Trial Setting
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
January 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Answer from Kimberly A Gerdeman from Kimberly A Gerdeman Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Citation GERDEMAN, KIMBERLY ANN Served 12/23/2014
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.