Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Johnson County, Hill College, City Of Alvarado, Alvarado Independent School District, Alvarado Independent School, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Charles E Brady, against Tipton, Joe W, Tipton, Joe Earl, Tipton, Eileen, Boy, Keith, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Bosworth, William C, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 13, 2013 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Constables Return EXECUTED EXECUTED Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order of Sale TIPTON, JOE EARL Served 11/09/2016 Returned 11/09/2016 TIPTON, JOE W Unserved
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
September 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order of Sale-Iss-Order of-Sale-JOCO Order of Sale Order of Sale-Iss-Order of-Sale-JOCO Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
July 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry *****************scan box 2375**************** *****************scan box 2375**************** Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
July 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Tax Suit (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Bosworth, William C, Jr.) Result: Held
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
July 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Final Judgment
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
July 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
July 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice /Judgment (Caleb Perkins, Patricia Stanley, & Joe Tipton) /Judgment (Caleb Perkins, Patricia Stanley, & Joe Tipton) Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
July 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Letter confirming hearing set for 7-28-15 @ 1:30 p.m confirming hearing set for 7-28-15 @ 1:30 p.m Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.