Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Bryan Collins Dba Busy B'S Steel Erector, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Clarence Finley Dba C & S Diesel, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 05, 2024 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedMarch 07, 2024 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Bench Trial - Small Claims (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McBroom, Ronald R.) | |
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Bond Set $500.00 | |
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Writ of Sequestration Clarence Finley dba C & S Diesel Unserved | |
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Order Granting Writ | |
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Writ of Sequestration | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Temporary EX Parte (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer McBroom, Ronald R.) | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Writ - Request Application and Affidavit for Writ of Sequestration Application and Affidavit for Writ of Sequestration |
|
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice - Hearing 5/16/2024 | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Bench Trial - Small Claims | |
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.