Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Johnson County, Hill College, Cleburne Independent School District, City Of Cleburne, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by R. Bruce Medley, against Martinez, Sara Zapata, Martinez, Aurelio Fraire, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Weeks, John Wilson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2019 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt Court Cost Fees Paid Court Cost Fees Paid Judge: Weeks, John Wilson |
|
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Constables Return
Judge: Weeks, John Wilson |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice MARTINEZ, SARA ZAPATA Unserved MARTINEZ, AURELIO FRAIRE Unserved
Judge: Weeks, John Wilson |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Sale MARTINEZ, SARA ZAPATA Unserved MARTINEZ, AURELIO FRAIRE Unserved
Judge: Weeks, John Wilson |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Constable Sale -Efiled to Constable 1 -Efiled to Constable 1 Judge: Weeks, John Wilson |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Sale -Efiled to Constable 1 -Efiled to Constable 1 Judge: Weeks, John Wilson |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Constables Return -Returned Unexecuted-Pulled prior to tax sale -Returned Unexecuted-Pulled prior to tax sale Judge: Weeks, John Wilson |
|
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Sale MARTINEZ, SARA ZAPATA Returned Unserved 12/03/2020 Returned 12/03/2020 MARTINEZ, AURELIO FRAIRE Returned Unserved 12/03/2020 Returned 12/03/2020
Judge: Weeks, John Wilson |
|
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Sale -E-filed to Constable 1 -E-filed to Constable 1 Judge: Weeks, John Wilson |
|
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Scan Box***** ***** Scan Box 3567 ***** ***** Scan Box 3567 ***** Judge: Weeks, John Wilson |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.