Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Johnson County, City Of Burleson, Burleson Independent School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Alison Davis Callison, against Mc Croskey, Melissa, Mc Croskey, Jonathan, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Hewlett, Sydney B presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2019 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment/Non Jury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judgment for Costs
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Bailiff's Certificate of Call
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officers Hewlett, Sydney B, Hewlett, Sydney B) Result: Held
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Final Hearing (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officers Hewlett, Sydney B, Hewlett, Sydney B) | |
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Setting Notice for November 9, 2022 at 10:30 am - sent to court for November 9, 2022 at 10:30 am - sent to court Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
July 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned -Returned Executed on 07/02/2020 -Returned Executed on 07/02/2020 Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
July 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued -Issued for Jonathan McCroskey-Johnson Co.-E-filed to Constable 2 -Issued for Jonathan McCroskey-Johnson Co.-E-filed to Constable 2 Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.