Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Johnson County, Hill College, Cleburne Independent School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by R. Bruce Medley, against Adair, Christopher Dean, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Bosworth, William C, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment/Non Jury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Scan Box ****SCAN BOX 3132**** ****SCAN BOX 3132**** Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice sent sent Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certification of Delinquent Tax Records PLTF'S EXH # 1 PLTF'S EXH # 1 Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Final Judgment
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Tax Suit (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bosworth, William C, Jr.) Result: Held
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Letter Confirming Hearing Aug 16, 2018 - ret from court Aug 16, 2018 - ret from court Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned - Christopher Dean Adair - EXECUTED - 06/08/18 - Christopher Dean Adair - EXECUTED - 06/08/18 Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
April 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Citation ADAIR, CHRISTOPHER DEAN Served 06/08/2018
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.