Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Joshua Independent School District, Johnson County, Hill College, City Of Joshua, City Of Burleson, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by R. Bruce Medley, against R8 Investments Homes Llc, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Neill, John E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2017 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment/Non Jury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice SENT SENT Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Rule 239A Certification
Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment for Costs
Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Tax Suit - Cost Only Tax Suit - Cost Only (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Neill, John E.) Result: Held Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Letter Confirming Hearing -sent to court via que RET -sent to court via que RET Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
April 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned EXECUTED - 04/04/18 to R8 Investments Home, LLC EXECUTED - 04/04/18 to R8 Investments Home, LLC Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued to R8 Investments Home, LLC - Johnson County to R8 Investments Home, LLC - Johnson County Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition Plaintiffs First Amended Petition - Issue Citations - Johnson County Plaintiffs First Amended Petition - Issue Citations - Johnson County Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Citation R8 INVESTMENTS HOMES LLC Served 04/04/2018
Judge: Neill, John E. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.