Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Johnson County, Hill College, Grandview Independent School District, City Of Grandview, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Alison Davis Callison, against Smith, Christy D., Garrison, Traci, Beaumont, Linda M., in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Bridewell, Wayne presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2017 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Scan Box *****SCAN BOX 3001***** *****SCAN BOX 3001***** Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice emailed attys, sent to defts emailed attys, sent to defts Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Tax Suit (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) Result: Held
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Rule 239A Certification
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Bailiff's Certificate of Call
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment for Costs
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
February 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Setting Notice - Monday, March 19, 2018 at 10:30 a.m. - Sent to Court Via Que Setting Notice Setting Notice - Monday, March 19, 2018 at 10:30 a.m. - Sent to Court Via Que Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned EXECUTED - 12/19/17 EXECUTED - 12/19/17 Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
December 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned EXECUTED - 12/18/17 EXECUTED - 12/18/17 Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.