Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Johnson County, Hill College, Alvarado Independent School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by R. Bruce Medley, against Williams, Ward S, Home Tax Solutions, Llc, Hernandez, Rocio, represented by Travis Colbrunn, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Neill, John E. Judgment of $8,963.85Awarded To: ALVARADO INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT, et alAwarded Against: ROCIO HERNANDEZ, et al presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2017 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment/Non Jury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Scan Box ***SCAN BOX 3222*** ***SCAN BOX 3222*** Judge: Neill, John E. Judgment of $8,963.85Awarded To: ALVARADO INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT, et alAwarded Against: ROCIO HERNANDEZ, et al |
|
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice SENT SENT Judge: Neill, John E. Judgment of $8,963.85Awarded To: ALVARADO INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT, et alAwarded Against: ROCIO HERNANDEZ, et al |
|
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Neill, John E. Judgment of $8,963.85Awarded To: ALVARADO INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT, et alAwarded Against: ROCIO HERNANDEZ, et al |
|
January 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certification of Delinquent Tax Records PLTF'S EXH # 1 PLTF'S EXH # 1 Judge: Neill, John E. Judgment of $8,963.85Awarded To: ALVARADO INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT, et alAwarded Against: ROCIO HERNANDEZ, et al |
|
January 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Tax Suit (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Neill, John E.) Result: Held
Judge: Neill, John E. Judgment of $8,963.85Awarded To: ALVARADO INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT, et alAwarded Against: ROCIO HERNANDEZ, et al |
|
January 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address
Judge: Neill, John E. Judgment of $8,963.85Awarded To: ALVARADO INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT, et alAwarded Against: ROCIO HERNANDEZ, et al |
|
January 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment
Judge: Neill, John E. Judgment of $8,963.85Awarded To: ALVARADO INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT, et alAwarded Against: ROCIO HERNANDEZ, et al |
|
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Letter Confirming Hearing Sent to Court-ret Sent to Court-ret Judge: Neill, John E. Judgment of $8,963.85Awarded To: ALVARADO INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT, et alAwarded Against: ROCIO HERNANDEZ, et al |
|
October 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned Executed on 10/16/18 Executed on 10/16/18 Judge: Neill, John E. Judgment of $8,963.85Awarded To: ALVARADO INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT, et alAwarded Against: ROCIO HERNANDEZ, et al |
|
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned -Returned Executed on 10-16-18 -Returned Executed on 10-16-18 Judge: Neill, John E. Judgment of $8,963.85Awarded To: ALVARADO INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT, et alAwarded Against: ROCIO HERNANDEZ, et al |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.