Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Joshua Independent School District, Johnson County, Texas, Hill College, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Alison Davis Callison, against Woolard, Shannon Rae, Ben Frank Amis And Kate L. Amis Joint Revocable Trust Dated October 21, 2006, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Bridewell, Wayne presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 27, 2015 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment/Non Jury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Scan Box *****SCAN BOX 3054***** *****SCAN BOX 3054***** Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
May 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice /Jmt (emailed atty, sent to defts) /Jmt (emailed atty, sent to defts) Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Tax Suit (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) 05/04/2018 Reset by Court to 06/04/2018 06/04/2018 Reset by Court to 05/30/2018 Result: Held
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Bailiff's Certificate of Call
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certification of Delinquent Tax Records PLTF'S EXH # 1 PLTF'S EXH # 1 Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
May 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Letter Confirming Hearing Reset Reset Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Setting Notice - Friday, May 4, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. - Sent to Court-ret - Friday, May 4, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. - Sent to Court-ret Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.