Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Department Of Family And Protective Services, filed a(n) Child Protection - Family case against Turner, Angela, Turner, Ronli, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 20, 2024 |
CategoryChild Protective Services |
Last RefreshedMarch 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Protection |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Attorney Pay Sheet Robert Ward - Emailed Robert Ward - Emailed |
|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Attorney Pay Sheet Tesa Michael - Emailed Tesa Michael - Emailed |
|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order for Required Participation in Family Preservation Services - Emailed in Family Preservation Services - Emailed |
|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Barkley, David A) Result: Held | |
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Barkley, David A) | |
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Family Plan Turner OTP TFF - February 2024 Turner OTP TFF - February 2024 |
|
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Original Answer | |
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned - Executed 2/23/2024 - R. Turner Citation Returned Citation Returned - Executed 2/23/2024 - R. Turner |
|
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned - Executed 02/23/2024 - A. Turner Citation Returned Citation Returned - Executed 02/23/2024 - A. Turner |
|
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Returned NOH Returned - Executed 2/23/2024 - R. Turner NOH Returned - Executed 2/23/2024 - R. Turner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.