Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Tovar, Jessica Maria, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Gamez, Ivan Guadalupe, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts 18th District Court with Casey Conine presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2024 |
CategoryPaternity - Iv-D |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Filing Court House18th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Conine, Casey Raymond) | |
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order for Parentage Testing Hrg 5/21/24 Hrg 5/21/24 |
|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Conine, Casey Raymond) | |
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Hrg 4/2/24 - Hrg 4/2/24 |
|
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned Jessica Maria Tovar Jessica Maria Tovar |
|
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned Ivan Guadalupe Gamez Ivan Guadalupe Gamez |
|
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Citation Tovar, Jessica Maria Served 02/05/2024 | |
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Citation GAMEZ, IVAN GUADALUPE Served 02/05/2024 | |
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Citation Tovar, Jessica Maria Unserved | |
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Citation GAMEZ, IVAN GUADALUPE Unserved |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.