Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Spence, Brianna Pauline, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Cates, Justin Lawrence, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2021 |
CategoryPaternity - Iv-D |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Establishing the Parent Child Relationship | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Conine, Casey Raymond) | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition 1st Amended Petition to Establish the Parent-Child Relationship and Petition in SAPCR 1st Amended Petition to Establish the Parent-Child Relationship and Petition in SAPCR |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Citation Returned | |
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Citation Cates, Justin Lawrence Served 05/01/2022 Returned 05/02/2022 | |
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Citation Reissue - AG Justin Lawrence Cates Justin Lawrence Cates |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Respondent Brianna Pauline Spence's Original Answer - *emailed AG Respondent Brianna Pauline Spence's Original Answer - *emailed AG |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Returned | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issue - PCT 2 Brianna Pauline Spence Brianna Pauline Spence |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Cates, Justin Lawrence Returned Unserved 10/12/2021 Returned 10/12/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.