Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Despaigne, Nora Lee, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Despaigne, Acelio Usatorre, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2019 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedMay 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) | |
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Dismissal Letter | |
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter to Court Re: Waiver/citation - put in court box Re: Waiver/citation - put in court box |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter from Petitioner-Requesting a Blank Waiver of Service, Sent her the TexasLawhelp.org Web Letter Letter from Petitioner-Requesting a Blank Waiver of Service, Sent her the TexasLawhelp.org Web |
|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter to Court Sent to Court Sent to Court |
|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter from Petitioner - w/Notes from court from Petitioner - w/Notes from court |
|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Final Decree of Divorce-Sent to Court in Box Final Decree of Divorce-Sent to Court in Box |
|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter from Petitioner-Sent to Court in Box Letter Letter from Petitioner-Sent to Court in Box |
|
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letter Re: Divorce - sent letter with instruction for pro se divorces Re: Divorce - sent letter with instruction for pro se divorces |
|
June 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letter from Petitioner Letter Letter from Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.