Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Santos, Luis Angel, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Martinez, Linette Santos, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Weeks, John Wilson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2019 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Scan Box *****SCAN BOX 3504***** *****SCAN BOX 3504***** Judge: Weeks, John Wilson |
|
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Weeks, John Wilson |
|
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice /DECREE (emailed atty Dick Turner; mailed to Linnette Santos Martinez) /DECREE (emailed atty Dick Turner; mailed to Linnette Santos Martinez) Judge: Weeks, John Wilson |
|
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Agreed Final Decree of Divorce
Judge: Weeks, John Wilson |
|
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Weeks, John Wilson) 03/13/2020 Reset by Court to 03/12/2020 Result: Held
Judge: Weeks, John Wilson |
|
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
E-Mail Correspondence Setting Hearing
Judge: Weeks, John Wilson |
|
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letter Confirming Hearing Sent to Court Sent to Court Judge: Weeks, John Wilson |
|
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letter Confirming Hearing - 3/13/20 @ 9:30 am - Sent to court via que Letter Confirming Hearing Letter Confirming Hearing - 3/13/20 @ 9:30 am - Sent to court via que Judge: Weeks, John Wilson |
|
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
E-Mail Correspondence Setting Hearing
Judge: Weeks, John Wilson |
|
December 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service
Judge: Weeks, John Wilson |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.