Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kirk, Lisa Marlene, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Kirk, Troy Don, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Bridewell, Wayne presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2017 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Scan Box *****SCAN BOX 3006***** *****SCAN BOX 3006***** Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) Result: Held
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Final Decree of Divorce
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice /Decree (emailed atty, sent to resp) /Decree (emailed atty, sent to resp) Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Letter Confirming Hearing
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Original Petition for Divorce Original Petition for Divorce Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Information Sheet
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.