Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rasor, Joel William, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Rasor, Vanessa Rheanne, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Hewlett, Sydney B presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2017 |
CategorySupport Order - Iv-D |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment/Non Jury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Conine, Casey Raymond)
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
November 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Confirming Support Arrearage EMAILED EMAILED Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
November 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order in Suit to Modify the Parent-Child Relationship
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
November 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Agreed Final Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Hewlett, Sydney B) Result: Held
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Precept Returned
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Letter from Court
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Return
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Citation Rasor, Joel William Served 09/11/2019 Returned 09/12/2019
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.