Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Salting Iii, Eric Peter-Labson, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Salting, Demetra Nanette Lemonitsakis, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Chrestman, Don presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2017 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Scan Box ****SCAN BOX 3004**** ****SCAN BOX 3004**** Judge: Chrestman, Don |
|
March 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Chrestman, Don |
|
March 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice SENT SENT Judge: Chrestman, Don |
|
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (4:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Chrestman, Don) Result: Held
Judge: Chrestman, Don |
|
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Final Decree of Divorce
Judge: Chrestman, Don |
|
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Letter Setting Hearing 3-15-18
Judge: Chrestman, Don |
|
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order - Final Decree of Divorce - Sent to Court-UNSIGNED - Final Decree of Divorce - Sent to Court-UNSIGNED Judge: Chrestman, Don |
|
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Letter Requesting Hearing - Sent to Court-ret - Sent to Court-ret Judge: Chrestman, Don |
|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service
Judge: Chrestman, Don |
|
December 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Original Petition for Divorce - Mediated Settlement Agreement Incident to a Divorce Original Petition for Divorce - Mediated Settlement Agreement Incident to a Divorce Judge: Chrestman, Don |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.