Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jones, Lindsey Dawn, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Golden, Mark Nolan, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Bosworth, William C, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 29, 2017 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry ******SCAN BOX 2853****** ******SCAN BOX 2853****** Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
August 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
August 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Final Decree of Divorce
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
August 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Decree ( Michael Kurmes, Mark Golden) Decree ( Michael Kurmes, Mark Golden) Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
August 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bosworth, William C, Jr.) Result: Held
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
August 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Letter Confirming Hearing Sent to Court Sent to Court Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
July 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Letter Requesting Hearing -sent to court via que -sent to court via que Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
July 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Appearance of Co-Counsel
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
June 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Final Decree of Divorce-Sent to Court Final Decree of Divorce-Sent to Court Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
June 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Current Address-Linsey Notice Notice of Current Address-Linsey Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.