Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Linthicum, Betty Lou, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Roth, Barbara, Flippin, Michael Ray, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Neill, John E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNeill, John E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2016 |
CategoryAll Other Family Law Matters |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment/Non Jury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail RE MAIL- INSF ADDRESS RE MAIL- INSF ADDRESS Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail RET MAIL- INSF ADDRESS RET MAIL- INSF ADDRESS Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
February 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice emailed to Tim Altaras, mailed to Michael Flippin, Barbara Rolph emailed to Tim Altaras, mailed to Michael Flippin, Barbara Rolph Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
February 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
February 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry ***** SCAN BOX 2692 ***** ***** SCAN BOX 2692 ***** Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order in Suit Affecting the Parent/Child Relationship
Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Neill, John E.) Result: Held
Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
January 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Letter Confirming Hearing
Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service - Barbara Rolph - Barbara Rolph Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service - Michael Ray Flippin - Michael Ray Flippin Judge: Neill, John E. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.