Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Abercrombie, Cathe Lee, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Abercrombie, Melvin, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Bridewell, Wayne presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 30, 2015 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry ****************scan box 2550***************** ****************scan box 2550***************** Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
June 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice (sent to Terri Wilson, Melvin Abercrombie) (sent to Terri Wilson, Melvin Abercrombie) Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
June 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
June 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Final Decree of Divorce
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
June 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) Result: Held
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
May 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Letter confirming hearing 6-6-16 confirming hearing 6-6-16 Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
April 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Letter from Repsondent req court orders name change of petitioner at final hearing. Letter Letter from Repsondent req court orders name change of petitioner at final hearing. Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
November 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
October 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Original petition for divorce-no service Original petition for divorce-no service Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.